No. 24A1
Title:Jake Delahney Taylor, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 3, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-40273)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2024Application (24A1) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 15, 2024 to September 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 10 2024Application (24A1) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Isaak
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe LLP
717 Texas, Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77002

disaak@steptoe.com
7132212352
Party name: Jake Delahney Taylor
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States