No. 24-994
Title:National Basketball Association, Petitioner
v.
Michael Salazar
Docketed:March 18, 2025
Linked with 24A629
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1147)
   Decision Date:October 15, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2024Application (24A629) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 13, 2025 to March 14, 2025, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 08 2025Application (24A629) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 14, 2025.
Mar 14 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2025)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2025Waiver of right of respondent Michael Salazar to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 26 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025.
Apr 02 2025Response Requested. (Due May 2, 2025)
Apr 22 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2025 to July 1, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 24 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2025.
May 02 2025Brief amicus curiae of National Football League filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2025Brief amici curiae of National Retail Federation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

SHAY.DVORETZKY@SKADDEN.COM
202-371-7370
Party name: National Basketball Association
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua Ian Hammack
    Counsel of Record
Bailey & Glasser, LLP
1055 Thomas Jefferson St. N.W., Suite 540
Washington, DC 20007

jhammack@baileyglasser.com
2024632101
Party name: Michael Salazar
Other
Michael Dominic Meuti
    Counsel of Record
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP
127 Public Square
Suite 4900
Cleveland, OH 44114

MMEUTI@BENESCHLAW.COM
(216) 363-6246
Party name: The National Retail Federation and Interactive Advertising Bureau
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: National Football League