No. 24-993 | |
Title: | Gabriel Olivier, Petitioner v. City of Brandon, Mississippi, et al. |
Docketed: | March 18, 2025 |
Linked with 24A717 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-60566) |
Decision Date: | August 25, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 14, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 15 2025 | Application (24A717) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2025 to March 14, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jan 21 2025 | Application (24A717) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 14, 2025. |
Mar 14 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 17 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent City of Brandon to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 11 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 14 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Life Legal Defense Foundation, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 15 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 16 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Young America's Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 16 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 17 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 17 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 17 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Stephen Nylen, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 17 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of International Society For Krishna Consciousness (ISKCON) filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 17 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights Defense Center filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 17 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 23 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025. |
Apr 29 2025 | Response Requested. (Due May 29, 2025) |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Allyson Ho Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 2001 Ross Avenue Suite 2100 Dallas, TX 75201 AHO@GIBSONDUNN.COM | (214) 698-3100 |
Party name: Gabriel Olivier | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Gregory Todd Butler Counsel of Record | Phelps Dunbar LLP 1905 Community Bank Way, Suite 200 P. O. Box 320159 Flowood, MS 39232 Todd.Butler@phelps.com | 601-360-9366 |
Party name: City of Brandon | ||
Other | ||
David Richard Dorey Counsel of Record | Liff, Walsh & Simmons 181 Harry S. Truman Parkway Suite 200 Annapolis, MD 21401 ddorey@liffwalsh.com | (410) 266-9500 |
Party name: International Society For Krishna Consciousness (ISKCON) | ||
John Allen Eidsmoe Counsel of Record | Foundation for Moral Law P.O. Box 148 Gallant, AL 35972 eidsmoeja@juno.com | 3342621245 |
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law | ||
Madison Leigh Hahn Counsel of Record | Young America's Foundation 11480 Commerce Park Drive, Ste 600 Reston, VA 20191 mhahn@yaf.org | 800-872-1776 |
Party name: Young America's Foundation | ||
Joshua Aaron House Counsel of Record | Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression 700 Pennsylvania Avenue SE, Suite 340 Washington, DC 20003 Joshua.House@thefire.org | (215) 717-3473 |
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression | ||
Jacob H. Huebert Counsel of Record | Liberty Justice Center 7500 Rialto Blvd. Suite 1-250 Austin, TX 78735 JHUEBERT@ljc.org | 512-481-4400 |
Party name: Liberty Justice Center | ||
Tobias Samuel Loss-Eaton Counsel of Record | Sidley Austin LLP 1501 K Street NW Washington, DC 20005 tlosseaton@sidley.com | 2027368427 |
Party name: Human Rights Defense Center | ||
Thomas Ryan McCarthy Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Boulevard Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22209 TOM@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM | 7032439423 |
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation | ||
Joshua Craig McDaniel Counsel of Record | Harvard Law School Religious Freedom Clinic 6 Everett St., Suite 5110 Cambridge, MA 02138 jmcdaniel@law.harvard.edu | 6174964383 |
Party name: Stephen Nylen, Jeremy Brown, Calvin VanKoevering, and Jordan Sweezer | ||
Jay Alan Sekulow Counsel of Record | American Center for Law & Justice 201 Maryland Avenue, N.E. Washington, DC 20002 sekulow@aclj.org | 2025468890 |
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice | ||
Ilya Shapiro Counsel of Record | Manhattan Institute 52 Vanderbilt Ave. New York, NY 10017 ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org | 212599-7000 |
Party name: Manhattan Institute | ||
Catherine Wynne Short Counsel of Record | Life Legal Defense Foundation P.O. Box 2105 Napa, CA 94558 kshort@lldf.org | (707) 224-6675 |
Party name: Life Legal, NATIONAL INTITUTE OF FAMILY AND LIFE ADVOCATES, HEARTBEAT INTERNATIONAL, INC., AND HUMAN COALITION |