No. 24-972 | |
Title: | Frank Bell, Tyson Rhame, and James Shaw, Petitioners v. United States |
Docketed: | March 11, 2025 |
Linked with 24A737 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-12750, 22-12751, 22-12752) |
Decision Date: | August 14, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 8, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 23 2025 | Application (24A737) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2025 to April 7, 2025, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jan 27 2025 | Application (24A737) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 8, 2025. |
Mar 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 09 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2025 to May 12, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 10 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Kannon K. Shanmugam Counsel of Record | Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP 2001 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20006 KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM | (202) 223-7300 |
Party name: Frank Bell, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |