No. 24-969 | |
Title: | Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al., Petitioners v. Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, et al. |
Docketed: | March 11, 2025 |
Linked with 24A696 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-50826) |
Decision Date: | June 19, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 12, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 13 2025 | Application (24A696) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 10, 2025 to April 11, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jan 16 2025 | Application (24A696) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 12, 2025. |
Mar 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 09 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2025 to May 12, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 10 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Noel John Francisco Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 NJFRANCISCO@JONESDAY.COM | (202) 879-3939 |
Party name: Community Financial Services Association of America, Limited, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: CFPB, et al. |