No. 24-968 | |
Title: | Diontai Moore, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | March 11, 2025 |
Linked with 24A633 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-1843) |
Decision Date: | August 2, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 9, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 20 2024 | Application (24A633) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 7, 2025 to February 6, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Dec 27 2024 | Application (24A633) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 6, 2025. |
Jan 21 2025 | Application (24A633) to extend further the time from February 6, 2025 to March 8, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Proof of ServiceWritten Request | |
Jan 27 2025 | Application (24A633) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 8, 2025. |
Mar 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 03 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2025 to May 12, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 08 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 12, 2025. |
Apr 22 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 12, 2025 to May 27, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 24 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 27, 2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Stacie Marion Fahsel Counsel of Record | Federal Public Defender for WDPA 1001 Liberty Avenue Suite 1500 Pittsburgh, PA 15215 stacie_fahsel@fd.org | 412-926-0779 |
Party name: Diontai Moore | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |