No. 24-967 | |
Title: | Grande Communications Networks, LLC, Petitioner v. UMG Recordings, Incorporated, et al. |
Docketed: | March 10, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-50162) |
Decision Date: | October 9, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 6, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 06 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 04 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2025 to May 9, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 07 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 9, 2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Daniel L. Geyser Counsel of Record | Haynes and Boone, LLP 2801 N. Harwood Street, Ste. 2300 Dallas, TX 75201 DANIEL.GEYSER@HAYNESBOONE.COM | 303-382-6219 |
Party name: Grande Communications Networks, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Paul D. Clement Counsel of Record | Clement & Murphy, PLLC 706 Duke Street Alexandria, VA 22314 PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM | (202) 742-8900 |
Party name: UMG Recordings, Inc., et al. |