No. 24-959 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Richard Gerald Jordan, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:March 6, 2025
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2022-DR-01243-SCT)
   Decision Date:October 1, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:December 5, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2025)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 7, 2025 to May 7, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 13 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2025.
May 07 2025Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2025Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 13 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/29/2025.
May 13 2025Reply of petitioner Richard Gerald Jordan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

DONALD.VERRILLI@MTO.COM
202-220-1100
Party name: Richard Gerald Jordan
Attorneys for Respondent
Allison Kay Hartman
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205

allison.hartman@ago.ms.gov
6019531783
Party name: Mississippi