No. 24-952
Title:South Point Energy Center LLC, Petitioner
v.
Arizona Department of Revenue, et al.
Docketed:March 5, 2025
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One
   Case Numbers:(1 CA-TX 20-0004)
   Decision Date:March 19, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 3, 2024

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2025Waiver of right of respondent Arizona Department of Revenue, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 26 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025.
Mar 31 2025Response Requested. (Due April 30, 2025)
Apr 22 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2025 to May 23, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 23 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: South Point Energy Center, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Kimberly Joan CyganArizona Attorney General's Office
2005 N. Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

kim.cygan@azag.gov
6025428391
Party name: Arizona Department of Revenue, et al.