No. 24-938 | |
Title: | American Airlines Group Inc., Petitioner v. United States, et al. |
Docketed: | March 3, 2025 |
Linked with 24A745 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-1802) |
Decision Date: | November 8, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 27 2025 | Application (24A745) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2025 to February 27, 2025, submitted to Justice Jackson. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 29 2025 | Application (24A745) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until February 27, 2025. |
Feb 27 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 17 2025 | Motion of the State respondents to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2025 to May 2, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 18 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2025, for all respondents. |
Apr 02 2025 | Motion of the Acting Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2025 to May 2, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 02 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of International Center for Law & Economics filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 03 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2025, for all respondents. |
Apr 21 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2025 to May 27, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 23 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 27, 2025, for all respondents. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Gregory George Garre Counsel of Record | Latham & Watkins LLP 555 Eleventh Street, NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20004 GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM | 202-637-2207 |
Party name: American Airlines Group Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Caroline Sage Van Zile Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General for D.C. Office of the Solicitor General 400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100 Washington, DC 20001 caroline.vanzile@dc.gov | (202) 724-6609 |
Party name: District of Columbia | ||
Other | ||
Anton Metlitsky Counsel of Record | O'Melveny & Myers 1301 Avenue of the Americas Suite 1700 New York, NY 10019 AMETLITSKY@OMM.COM | 212-326-2000 |
Party name: The International Center for Law & Economics |