No. 24-910 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Charles Ray Crawford, Petitioner v. Burl Cain, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections, et al. |
Docketed: | February 24, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-61019) |
Decision Date: | November 22, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 20 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 03 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2025 to April 25, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 04 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2025. |
Apr 25 2025 | Brief of respondents Burl Cain, Commissioner, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Counsel of Record | Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP 601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW Suite 500E Washington, DC 20001-5369 DONALD.VERRILLI@MTO.COM | 202-220-1101 |
Party name: Charles Ray Crawford | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Justin L. Matheny Counsel of Record | Office of the Mississippi Attorney General P.O. Box 220 Jackson, MS 39205 justin.matheny@ago.ms.gov | 601-359-3680 |
Party name: Cain, Comm'r, MS DOC, et al. |