No. 24-906 | |
Title: | Lexington Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation, Petitioner v. Martin A. Mueller, Judge, Cabazon Reservation Court, et al. |
Docketed: | February 24, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-55144, 23-55193) |
Decision Date: | December 6, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 20 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 21 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2025 to April 25, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 24 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2025. |
Apr 15 2025 | Brief of respondents Martin Mueller, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Miguel A. Estrada Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 1700 M Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 mestrada@gibsondunn.com | (202) 955-8500 |
Party name: Lexington Insurance Company | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Glenn M. Feldman Counsel of Record | Procopio 4800 N. Scottsdale Rd. Suite 2000 Scottsdale, AZ 85251 glenn.feldman@procopio.com | 4086824312 |
Party name: Martin Mueller, et al. |