No. 24-904 | |
Title: | Alpine Securities Corporation, Petitioner v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, et al. |
Docketed: | February 24, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-5129) |
Decision Date: | November 22, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 20 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 19 2025 | Motion of the Acting Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2025 to April 25, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 20 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2025. |
Mar 20 2025 | Motion of Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2025 to April 25, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 21 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2025, for all respondents. |
Mar 26 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 25 2025 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 25 2025 | Brief of respondent Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 12 2025 | Reply of petitioner Alpine Securities Corporation filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 13 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/29/2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
David H. Thompson Counsel of Record | Cooper & Kirk, PLLC 1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM | 202-220-9600 |
Party name: Alpine Securities Corporation | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, D 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Amir Cameron Tayrani Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 1700 M Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 atayrani@gibsondunn.com | (202) 887-3692 |
Party name: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. | ||
Other | ||
Margaret Ann Little Counsel of Record | New Civil Liberties Alliance 4250 N. Fairfax Dr.. Suite 300 Arlington, VA 22203 PEGGY.LITTLE@NCLA.legal | 2028695210 |
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance |