No. 24-889 | |
Title: | Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | February 19, 2025 |
Linked with 2 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2023-1169) |
Decision Date: | June 25, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 17, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 27 2024 | Application (24A652) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2025 to February 14, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 03 2025 | Application (24A652) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 14, 2025. |
Feb 14 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 21, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 04 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2025 to April 21, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 05 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 21, 2025. |
Mar 20 2025 | Brief amici curiae of 30 Scholars of Law, Economics, and Medicine filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 21 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 04 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2025 to May 15, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 07 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2025. |
May 15 2025 | Brief of respondents Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Charles Bennett Klein Counsel of Record | Winston & Strawn LLP 1901 L Street NW Washington, DC 20036 cklein@winston.com | (202) 282-5000 |
Party name: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. and Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Michael Robert Huston Counsel of Record | Perkins Coie LLP 2525 E. Camelback Road Suite 500 Phoenix, AZ 85016 mhuston@perkinscoie.com | 202-434-1630 |
Party name: Amarin Pharma, Inc., et al. | ||
Other | ||
Charles Duan Counsel of Record | American University Washington College of Law 4300 Nebraska Avenue NW Washington, DC 20016 supremecourt.gov@cduan.com | (202) 274-4124 |
Party name: 30 Scholars of Law, Economics, and Medicine | ||
Matthew S. Hellman Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Ave., NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 MHELLMAN@JENNER.COM | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines |