No. 24-887 | |
Title: | Johnny Moats, Sheriff, Polk County, Georgia, et al., Petitioners v. Stephen Jarrard |
Docketed: | February 19, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-10332) |
Decision Date: | September 16, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 12, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 21, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 07 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2025 to April 4, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 10 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 4, 2025. |
Apr 04 2025 | Brief of respondent Stephen Jarrard in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 23 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025. |
May 19 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Terry E. Williams Counsel of Record | Williams, Morris & Blum, LLC 4330 South Lee Street Building 400, Suite A Buford, GA 30518 terry@wmwlaw.com | 678-541-0790 |
Party name: Sheriff Johnny Moats, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
John Archer Meiser Counsel of Record | Lindsay and Matt Moroun Religious Liberty Clinic Notre Dame Law School 1338 Biolchini Hall Notre Dame, IN 46556 JMEISER@ND.EDU | 574-631-3880 |
Party name: Stephen Jarrard |