No. 24-884 | |
Title: | Lexington Insurance Company, et al., Petitioners v. Suquamish Tribe, et al. |
Docketed: | February 18, 2025 |
Linked with 24A528 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-35784) |
Decision Date: | February 29, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 16, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 25 2024 | Application (24A528) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 15, 2024 to February 13, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Dec 03 2024 | Application (24A528) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 13, 2025. |
Feb 13 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 17 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2025 to April 18, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 18 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 18, 2025. |
Mar 20 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of American Property Casualty Insurance Association filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 15 2025 | Brief of respondents Suquamish Tribe, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025. |
Apr 29 2025 | Reply of petitioners Lexington Insurance Company, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Miguel A. Estrada Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 1700 M Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 mestrada@gibsondunn.com | (202) 955-8500 |
Party name: Lexington Insurance Company | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Daniel L. Geyser Counsel of Record | Haynes and Boone, LLP 2801 N. Harwood Street, Ste. 2300 Dallas, TX 75201 DANIEL.GEYSER@HAYNESBOONE.COM | 303-382-6219 |
Party name: Suquamish Tribe, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Laura Anne Foggan Counsel of Record | Crowell & Moring LLP 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20004-2595 lfoggan@crowell.com | 2026242774 |
Party name: American Property Casualty Insurance Association |