No. 24-860 | |
Title: | Johnnie Markel Carter, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | February 11, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (24-1115) |
Decision Date: | December 2, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 11 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 28 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Families Against Mandatory Minimums (FAMM) filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 04 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Clinical Law Professors filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 05 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2025 to April 14, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 06 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2025. |
Mar 13 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Former Bureau of Prisons Officials filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 10 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2025 to May 5, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 11 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 5, 2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
David A. O'Neil Counsel of Record | Debevoise & Plimpton LLP 801 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W. Washington, DC 20004 daoneil@debevoise.com | (202) 383-8000 |
Party name: Johnnie Markel Carter | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Other | ||
Scott P. Lewis Counsel of Record | Anderson & Kreiger LLP 50 Milk Street 21st Floor Boston, MA 02109 lewis@andersonkreiger.com | 6176216500 |
Party name: Former Bureau of Prisons Officials | ||
Jarrod Lee Schaeffer Counsel of Record | Abell Eskew Landau LLP 256 5th Avenue 5th Floor New York, NY 10001 jschaeffer@aellaw.com | 646-970-7339 |
Party name: FAMM | ||
Erica Kristine Zunkel Counsel of Record | Criminal and Juvenile Justice Clinic University of Chicago Law School 6020 S. University Avenue Chicago, IL 60637 ezunkel@uchicago.edu | 773-702-9611 |
Party name: Clinical Law Professors |