No. 24-855 | |
Title: | Shen Zhen New World I, LLC, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | February 11, 2025 |
Linked with 24A505 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-972) |
Decision Date: | September 11, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 19 2024 | Application (24A505) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2024 to February 7, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 21 2024 | Application (24A505) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 7, 2025. |
Feb 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 11 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2025 to April 14, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 13 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2025. |
Apr 09 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2025 to May 14, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 10 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 14, 2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Gerald Brinton Lucas Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001 blucas@jonesday.com | 202-879-3939 |
Party name: Shen Zhen New World I, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |