No. 24-844 | |
Title: | Joseph Srour, Petitioner v. City of New York, New York, et al. |
Docketed: | February 7, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-7549) |
Decision Date: | September 9, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 17, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 15 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 10, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 26 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. |
Apr 21 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Amy L. Bellantoni Counsel of Record | The Bellantoni Law Firm, PLLC 2 Overhill Road, Suite 400 Scarsdale, NY 10583 abell@bellantoni-law.com | 914-367-0090 |
Party name: Joseph Srour | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elina Druker Counsel of Record | New York City Law Department 100 Church Street New York, NY 10007 edruker@law.nyc.gov | 9175728583 |
Party name: New York City, New York, et al. |