No. 24-796
Title:Missouri, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:January 27, 2025
Linked with 24A476
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1457)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2024Application (24A476) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 24, 2024 to January 23, 2025, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 14 2024Application (24A476) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 23, 2025.
Jan 23 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2025 to March 28, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 03 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 28, 2025.
Feb 26 2025Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2025Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2025 to April 11, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 11, 2025.
Apr 11 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2025 to April 25, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 14 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 25, 2025.
Apr 24 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2025 to May 26, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 25 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 27, 2025 . See Rule 30.1.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joshua Michael Divine
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Missouri Attorney General
Solicitor General
207 West High Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101

josh.divine@ago.mo.gov
573-751-8870
Party name: Missouri, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Hashim M. Mooppan
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530

Charlene.W.Goodwin@usdoj.gov
202-514-2201
Party name: United States
Other
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Heller Foundation, Tennessee Firearms Association, Tennessee Firearms Foundation, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Virginia Citizens Defense Foundation, Grass Roots North Carolina, Rights Watch International, America’s Future, DownsizeDC.org, Downsize DC Foundation, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Montana Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders Street
Helena, MT 59601

PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV
406-444-2026
Party name: Montana, et al.