No. 24-784 | |
Title: | Arch Resources, Inc., fka Arch Coal, et al., Petitioners v. Douglas Pennington, Acting Director, Office of Workers' Compensation Programs, Department of Labor, et al. |
Docketed: | January 23, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-3332) |
Decision Date: | August 5, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 15, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 10 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 30 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 24, 2025 to March 26, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 31 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 26, 2025, for all respondents. |
Feb 24 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of National Mining Association filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 24 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Milliman, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 19 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2025 to April 16, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 20 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 16, 2025, for all respondents. |
Apr 16 2025 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 16 2025 | Brief of respondent Cynthia E. Howard in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Reply of petitioners Arch Resources, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 06 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Dominic Emil Draye Counsel of Record | Greenberg Traurig LLP 2101 L Street N.W. Washington, DC 20037 drayed@gtlaw.com | (202) 331-3168 |
Party name: Arch Resources, Inc., , et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, D 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America | ||
Evan Barret Smith Counsel of Record | AppalReD Legal Aid 120 N. Front Ave Prestonsburg, KY 41653 evans@ardfky.org | 606.889.1958 |
Party name: Cynthia E. Howard, widow of David M. Howard | ||
Other | ||
Aaron Thomas Martin Counsel of Record | Martin Law & Mediation PLLC 2415 East Camelback Road Suite 700 Phoenix, AZ 85016 aaron@martinlawandmediation.com | 6028122680 |
Party name: Milliman, Inc. | ||
Daniel William Wolff Counsel of Record | Crowell & Moring LLP 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue. NW Washington, DC 20004 dwolff@crowell.com | 202-624-2621 |
Party name: National Mining Association |