No. 24-783 | |
Title: | Enbridge Energy, LP, et al., Petitioners v. Dana Nessel, Attorney General of Michigan, on Behalf of the People of the State of Michigan |
Docketed: | January 23, 2025 |
Linked with 2 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-1671) |
Decision Date: | June 17, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 16, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 23 2024 | Application (24A410) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 14, 2024 to January 13, 2025, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main Document | |
Oct 28 2024 | Response to application from respondent Dana Nessel, Attorney General of the State of Michigan, on behalf of the People of the State of Michigan filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 28 2024 | Application (24A410) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 13, 2025. |
Jan 13 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 11 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Dana Nessel, Attorney General of the State of Michigan, on behalf of the People of the State of Michigan to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 19 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/7/2025. |
Feb 19 2025 | Brief amici curiae of North America's Building Trades Unions, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 20 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Professor Arthur R. Miller filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 27 2025 | Response Requested. (Due March 31, 2025) |
Mar 21 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2025 to April 29, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 24 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2025. |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief of respondent Dana Nessel, Michigan Attorney General in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 12 2025 | Reply of petitioners Enbridge Energy, LP, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 13 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/29/2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Alice Loughran Counsel of Record | Steptoe & Johnson LLP 1330 Connecticut Ave., NW Washington, DC 20036-1795 aloughran@steptoe.com | 202-429-6202 |
Party name: Enbridge Energy, Limited Partnership, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Ann Maurine Sherman Counsel of Record | Michigan Department of Attorney General G. Mennen Williams Building P.O. Box 30212 Lansing, MI 48909 SHERMANA@MICHIGAN.GOV | 517-335-7628 |
Party name: Dana Nessel, Attorney General of the State of Michigan, on behalf of the People of the State of Michigan | ||
Other | ||
Jonathan D Newman Counsel of Record | Sherman Dunn, P.C. 900 Seventh Street, N.W., Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20001 newman@shermandunn.com | 2027859300 |
Party name: North America's Building Trades Unions | ||
Alexander Volokh Counsel of Record | Emory Law School 1301 Clifton Rd NE Atlanta, GA 30322 avolokh@emory.edu | 404-727-5225 |
Party name: Professor Arthur R. Miller |