No. 24-758 | |
Title: | The GEO Group, Inc., Petitioner v. Alejandro Menocal, et al. |
Docketed: | January 16, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-1409) |
Decision Date: | October 22, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 13 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 18, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 04 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2025 to March 20, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 05 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 20, 2025. |
Feb 14 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Professional Services Council filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 14 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Renown Health filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 13 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2025 to April 21, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 14 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 21, 2025. |
Apr 21 2025 | Brief of respondents Alejandro Menocal, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 02 2025 | Reply of petitioner The GEO Group, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 06 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Dominic Emil Draye Counsel of Record | Greenberg Traurig LLP 2101 L Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20037 drayed@gtlaw.com | (202) 331-3100 |
Party name: The GEO Group, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Jennifer Dale Bennett Counsel of Record | Gupta Wessler LLP 505 Montgomery Street Suite 625 San Francisco, CA 94111 JENNIFER@GUPTAWESSLER.COM | (415) 573-0336 |
Party name: Alejandro Menocal, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Hugh C. Griffin Counsel of Record | Hall Prangle & Schoonveld, LLC 200 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3300 Chicago, IL 60606 hgriffin@hpslaw.com | (312) 345-9600 |
Party name: Renown Health | ||
Daniel L Russell Jr. Counsel of Record | Covington & Burling LLP One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW Washington, DC 20001 DRussell@cov.com | 202-662-6000 |
Party name: The Professional Services Council |