No. 24-757 | |
Title: | The Gym 24/7 Fitness, LLC, Petitioner v. Michigan |
Docketed: | January 16, 2025 |
Linked with 2 | |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Michigan |
Case Numbers: | (355148) |
Decision Date: | March 31, 2022 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | August 30, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 25 2024 | Application (24A418) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2024 to January 16, 2025, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Oct 31 2024 | Application (24A418) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 16, 2025. |
Jan 14 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 18, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 11 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Michigan to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 13 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Rental Housing Association of Washington filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 14 2025 | Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business (NFIB) Small Business Legal Center, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 18 2025 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of REALTORS®, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 18 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 18 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of New York Apartment Association filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 26 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/21/2025. |
Feb 27 2025 | Response Requested. (Due March 31, 2025) |
Mar 04 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2025 to April 30, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 05 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2025. |
Mar 28 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Citizen Action Defense Fund, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 30 2025 | Brief of respondent Michigan in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 09 2025 | Reply of The Gym 24/7 Fitness, LLC submitted. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jonathan M. Houghton Counsel of Record | Pacific Legal Foundation 3100 Clarendon Blvd. Suite 1000 Arlington, VA 22201 Jhoughton@pacificlegal.org | 2028886881 |
Party name: The Gym 24/7 Fitness, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Ann Maurine Sherman Counsel of Record | Michigan Department of Attorney General G. Mennen Williams Building P.O. Box 30212 Lansing, MI 48909 SHERMANA@MICHIGAN.GOV | 517-335-7628 |
Party name: State of Michigan | ||
Other | ||
Michael M. Berger Counsel of Record | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP 2049 Century Park East Suite 1700 Los Angeles, CA 90067 MMBERGER@MANATT.COM | (310) 312-4185 |
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business (NFIB) Small Business Legal Center, Inc. and Owners Counsel of America | ||
Gerald Brinton Lucas Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001 blucas@jonesday.com | 202-879-3939 |
Party name: National Association of REALTORS®, Manufactured Housing Institute, National Apartment Association, National Multifamily Housing Council, and Michigan REALTORS® | ||
Jonathan S. Massey Counsel of Record | Massey & Gail LLP 1000 Maine Avenue SW Suite 450 Washington, DC 20024 JMASSEY@MASSEYGAIL.COM | 202-652-4511 |
Party name: New York Apartment Association | ||
Sam Spiegelman Counsel of Record | Citizen Action Defense Fund 111 21st Avenue SW, Ste. 13 Olympia, WA 98501 sam@citizenactiondefense.org | 8505193495 |
Party name: Citizen Action Defense Fund, Building Industry Association of Washington, and Washington Business Properties Association | ||
Philip Albert Talmadge Counsel of Record | 2775 Harbor Avenue SW Third Floor, Suite C Seattle, WA 98126 phil@tal-fitzlaw.com | 2065746661 |
Party name: Rental Housing Association of Washington | ||
David Christian Tryon Counsel of Record | The Buckeye Institute 88 East Broad Street, Suite 1300 Columbus, OH 43215 d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org | (614) 224-4422 |
Party name: The Buckeye Institute |