No. 24-734 | |
Title: | Strategic Technology Institute, Incorporated, Petitioner v. MGMTL, L.L.C. |
Docketed: | January 13, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-30298) |
Decision Date: | August 27, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 8, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 06 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 17 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent MGMTL, LLC to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 22 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. |
Feb 24 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Micah J. Fincher Counsel of Record | Fincher Law 900 Camp Street New Orleans, LA 70130 micah@fincher.co | 2142064619 |
Party name: Strategic Technology Institute, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Thomas More Flanagan Counsel of Record | Flanagan Partners LLP 201 St. Charles Ave Suite 3300 New Orleans, LA 70170 tflanagan@flanaganpartners.com | 5045690235 |
Party name: MGMTL, LLC |