No. 24-726 | |
Title: | DISH Network L.L.C., Petitioner v. Dragon Intellectual Property LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | January 10, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2022-1621, 2022-1622, 2022-1777, 2022-1779) |
Decision Date: | May 20, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 10, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 08 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 03 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Dragon Intellectual Property, LLC to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 04 2025 | Waiver of right of respondents Freitas & Weinberg LLP; Robert E. Freitas to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 05 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. |
Feb 06 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Nextremity Solutions, LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 10 2025 | Brief amici curiae of High Tech Inventors Alliance, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 10 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Unified Patents, LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 24 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Lauren Jarvis Dreyer Counsel of Record | Baker Botts LLP 700 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20001-5692 lauren.dreyer@bakerbotts.com | 202-639-7823 |
Party name: DISH Network L.L.C. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Robert Edward Freitas Counsel of Record | Freitas & Weinberg LLP 303 Twin Dolphin Drive Suite 600 Redwood Shores, CA 94065 rfreitas@fawlaw.com | 6505936300 |
Party name: Freitas & Weinberg LLP; Robert E. Freitas | ||
James Francis McDonough III Counsel of Record | Rozier Hardt McDonough PLLC 659 Auburn Avenue NE, Unit 254 Atlanta, GA 30312 jim@rhmtrial.com | (404) 564-1866 |
Party name: Dragon Intellectual Property, LLC | ||
Other | ||
Sarah M. Harris Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Unified Patents, LLC | ||
Joseph Davod Matal Counsel of Record | Clear IP, LLC 800 17th St., NW Suite 500 Washington, DC 20006 joseph.matal@clearpatents.com | 2026544500 |
Party name: High Tech Inventors Alliance and the National Retail Federation | ||
Teige Patrick Sheehan Counsel of Record | Heslin Rothenberg Farley & Mesiti, PC 5 Columbia Circle Albany, NY 12203 teige.sheehan@hrfmlaw.com | 5184525600 |
Party name: Nextremity Solutions LLC | ||
Jonathan Rudolph Kominek Stroud Counsel of Record | Unified Patents, LLC 4445 Willard Avenue Suite 600 Chevy Chase, MD 20815 JONATHAN@UNIFIEDPATENTS.COM | (202) 805-8931 |
Party name: Unified Patents, LLC |