No. 24-724 | |
Title: | The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Sarah Palmquist, Individually and as Next Friend of E.P., a Minor, et al. |
Docketed: | January 10, 2025 |
Linked with 2 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-40197) |
Decision Date: | May 28, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 9, 2024 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 22 2024 | Application (24A519) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 8, 2024 to January 8, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 26 2024 | Application (24A519) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 7, 2025. |
Jan 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 29 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2025 to March 12, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 30 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2025. |
Feb 03 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 10 2025 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 12 2025 | Brief of respondents Sarah Palmquist, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 25 2025 | Reply of petitioners The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 26 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. |
Apr 21 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/25/2025. |
Apr 28 2025 | Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. |
May 08 2025 | Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. |
Main Document | |
May 12 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 27, 2025. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 11, 2025. |
May 16 2025 | Motion of The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. to dispense with joint appendix submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Sarah Elaine Harrington Counsel of Record | Covington & Burling LLP One CityCenter, 850 Tenth St. NW Washington, DC 20001 sharrington@cov.com | 202-662-6000 |
Party name: The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Russell S. Post Counsel of Record | Beck Redden LLP 1221 McKinney Street Suite 4500 Houston, TX 77010 rpost@beckredden.com | 7139513700 |
Party name: Sarah Palmquist, Individually and as Next Friend of E.P., a Minor, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Lawrence S. Ebner Counsel of Record | Atlantic Legal Foundation 1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200 Washington, DC 20006 lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org | 202-729-6337 |
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation | ||
Jaime Ann Santos Counsel of Record | Goodwin Procter LLP 1900 N St. NW Washington, DC 20036 JSANTOS@GOODWINLAW.COM | 2023464000 |
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers, Consumer Brands Association, FMI, The Food Industry Association, and National Retail Federation |