No. 24-711 | |
Title: | Joe Morford, Petitioner v. Maurizio Cattelan |
Docketed: | January 3, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-12263) |
Decision Date: | August 16, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 15, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 31 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2025) |
Petition | |
Jan 15 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2025 to March 5, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 30 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2025. |
Mar 05 2025 | Brief of respondent Maurizio Cattelan in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 18 2025 | Reply of petitioner Joe Morford filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 19 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/4/2025. |
Apr 07 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Joe Morford | 1125 E. Broadway #216 Glendale, CA 91205 | 818-422-9263 |
Party name: Joe Morford | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Adam M. Cohen Counsel of Record | Kane Kessler, P.C. 600 Third Avenue New York, NY 10016-1901 acohen@kanekessler.com | 212-541-6222 |
Party name: Maurizio Cattelan | ||
Adam Moss Cohen | Kane Kessler, P.C. 600 Third Avenue New York, NY 10016 acohen@kanekessler.com | 212-541-6222 |
Party name: Maurizio Cattelan | ||
Dana Michelle Susman | Kane Kessler, P.C. 600 Third Avenue-35th Floor New York, NY 10016 dsusman@kanekessler.com | 212-519-5136 |
Party name: Maurizio Cattelan |