No. 24-6984 | |
Title: | Tyrone Woodson, Petitioner v. Florida |
Docketed: | April 14, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fourth District |
Case Numbers: | (4D2023-2481) |
Decision Date: | October 2, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 23, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 07 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 14, 2025) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 16 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Florida to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 17 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Joseph A. DiRuzzo III Counsel of Record | Margulis Gelfand DiRuzzo & Lambson 401 East Las Olas Blvd. Suite 1400 Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301 jd@margulisgelfand.com | 954.615.1676 |
Party name: Tyrone Woodson | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Celia A. Terenzio Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 1515 N. Flagler Drive, Suite 900 West Palm Beach, FL 33401 CELIA.TERENZIO@MYFLORIDALEGAL.COM | 561-268-5315 |
Party name: Florida |