No. 24-6924
Title:John Gabriel Trevino, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 3, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-11180)
   Decision Date:December 31, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 5, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 15 2025Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 17 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christy Posnett Martin
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender-Northern District of Texas
525 S. Griffin Street
Suite 629
Dallas, TX 75202

CHRISTY_MARTIN@FD.ORG
214-767-2746
Party name: John Trevino
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States