No. 24-685
Title:Susan McBrine, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:December 27, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-1542)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:October 4, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2025 to February 26, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 23 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2025.
Jan 27 2025Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2025 to March 28, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 18 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 28, 2025.
Mar 28 2025Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 15 2025Reply of petitioners Susan McBrine, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 16 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Franklin Bash
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I ST NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

johnbash@quinnemanuel.com
2025388000
Party name: Susan McBrine and David L. Petrie
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jeffrey Robert White
    Counsel of Record
American Association for Justice
777 6th Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20001-3723

jeffrey.white@justice.org
2026175620
Party name: American Association for Justice