No. 24-683
Title:Energetic Tank, Inc., as Owner of the M/V Alnic MC, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:December 26, 2024
Linked with 24A351
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1765, 22-2774, 22-2871, 22-2883)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 10 2024Application (24A351) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 24, 2024 to December 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 15 2024Application (24A351) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 23, 2024.
Dec 20 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2025)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2025 to February 26, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 03 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2025.
Jan 27 2025Brief amici curiae of Tim & Natalie Case Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2025 to March 28, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 28, 2025.
Mar 28 2025Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 16 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025.
Apr 16 2025Reply of petitioner Energetic Tank, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

ALLON.KEDEM@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
2029425000
Party name: Energetic Tank, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Natalie Khawam
    Counsel of Record
601 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
South Building, Ste. 900
Washington, DC 20004

attorneynkc@gmail.com
8136252820
Party name: Tim & Natalie Case Foundation