No. 24-6823 | |
Title: | Thomas Caves, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | March 21, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-6176) |
Decision Date: | December 26, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 19 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 21, 2025) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | |
Mar 25 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 27 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. |
Apr 21 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Peter J Tomao Counsel of Record | Peter J. Tomao, Esq. 600 Old Country Road, Suite 328 Garden City, NY 11530 ptomao@tomaolaw.com | 516-877-7015 |
Party name: Thomas Caves | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |