No. 24-6778 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Jessie Hoffman, Petitioner v. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, et al. |
Docketed: | March 16, 2025 |
Linked with 24A893 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (25-70006) |
Decision Date: | March 14, 2025 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 16 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. |
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | |
Mar 16 2025 | Application (24A893) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 17 2025 | Brief of respondent Gary Westcott, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | |
Mar 17 2025 | Amicus brief of State of Alabama submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 18 2025 | Reply of petitioner Jessie Hoffman filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 18 2025 | Application (24A893) referred to the Court. |
Mar 18 2025 | Application (24A893) for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. Justice Sotomayor, Justice Kagan, and Justice Jackson would grant the application for stay of execution. Justice Gorsuch dissents. (Detached Opinion) |
Mar 27 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. |
Apr 21 2025 | The petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed as moot. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrianna Kastanek Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 353 N. Clark St. Chicago, IL 60654 AKastanek@jenner.com | 312-840-7285 |
Party name: Jessie Hoffman | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga Counsel of Record | Louisiana Department of Justice 1885 N. Third Street Baton Rouge, LA 70802 aguinagaj@ag.louisiana.gov | 225-506-3746 |
Party name: Gary Westcott, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr. Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 501 Washington Ave Montgomery, AL 36130 EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV | 334-242-7300 |
Party name: State of Alabama |