No. 24-6775 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Edward Thomas James, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:March 17, 2025
Linked with 24A890
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC2025-0280, SC2025-0281)
   Decision Date:March 13, 2025
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2025Application (24A890) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 17 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Mar 18 2025Response to application from respondent Florida filed.
Main Document
Mar 18 2025Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2025Reply of applicant Edward Thomas James filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 19 2025Reply of petitioner Edward Thomas James filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Mar 20 2025Application (24A890) referred to the Court.
Mar 20 2025Application (24A890) for a stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court is denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.
Mar 20 2025Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dawn Brandi Macready
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel - North
1004 DeSoto Park Drive
Tallahassee, FL 32301

dawn.macready@ccrc-north.org
850-487-0922
Party name: Edward T. James
Attorneys for Respondent
Carla Suzanne Bechard
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Florida
3507 E. Frontage Road, Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607

CARLASUZANNE.BECHARD@MYFLORIDALEGAL.COM
813-287-7900
Party name: Florida