No. 24-652 | |
Title: | David Cassirer, et al., Petitioners v. Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation |
Docketed: | December 17, 2024 |
Linked with 24A293 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-55616) |
Decision Date: | January 9, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 9, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 23 2024 | Application (24A293) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 7, 2024 to December 6, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service | |
Sep 26 2024 | Application (24A293) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 6, 2024. |
Dec 06 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2025) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | |
Dec 20 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025. |
Jan 02 2025 | Response Requested. (Due February 3, 2025) |
Feb 03 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Monuments Men and Women Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 03 2025 | Brief amici curiae of The 1939 Society, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 03 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Comunidad Judía de Madrid, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 03 2025 | Brief of respondent Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 18 2025 | Reply of petitioners David Cassirer, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 19 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/7/2025. |
Mar 10 2025 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Assem. Bill 2867, 2023–2024 Reg. Sess. (Cal. 2024). |
Apr 11 2025 | Judgment Issued. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
David Boies Counsel of Record | Boies Schiller Flexner LLP 333 Main Street Armonk, NY 10504 dboies@bsfllp.com | (914) 749-8200 |
Party name: David Cassirer, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Thaddeus John Stauber Counsel of Record | Nixon Peabody LLP 300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 4100 Los Angeles, CA 90071 tstauber@nixonpeabody.com | 310-498-9975 |
Party name: Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection | ||
Other | ||
Patrick Thomas Byrne | B. Cremades y Asociados Goya 18, 20 Madrid, Spain, XX 28001 p.byrne@bcremades.com | +34 914237200 |
Party name: Comunidad Judía de Madrid and Federación de Comunidades Judías de España | ||
Bernardo Maria Cremades Roman Counsel of Record | B. Cremades Y Asociados, S.L. CALLE GOYA 18 (FLOOR 2) MADRID (SPAIN), XX 28001 bcr@bcremades.com | +34914237200 |
Party name: Comunidad Judía de Madrid and Federación de Comunidades Judías de España | ||
Robert Espensen Kohn Counsel of Record | Kohn Law Group, Inc. 100 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 700 Santa Monica, CA 90401 rkohn@kohnlawgroup.com | 310-917-1011 |
Party name: Monuments Men and Women Foundation | ||
Benjamin Gross Shatz Counsel of Record | Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP 2049 Century Park East Suite 1700 Los Angles, CA 90067-3119 bshatz@manatt.com | 3103124000 |
Party name: The 1939 Society, Bet Tzedek, et al. |