No. 24-649 | |
Title: | The Gun Range, LLC, Petitioner v. City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, et al. |
Docketed: | December 16, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | Commonwealth Court of Pennsylvania |
Case Numbers: | (90 CD 2021) |
Decision Date: | February 27, 2024 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | September 9, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 09 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 15, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 08 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent The City of Philadelphia to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 29 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. |
Feb 24 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Dawn M. Tancredi Counsel of Record | 2005 Market Street 16th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19103 dmtancredi@zarwin.com | 2158253587 |
Party name: The Gun Range, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Jane Lovitch Istvan Counsel of Record | City of Philadelphia Law Department 1515 Arch Street 17th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19102 jane.istvan@phila.gov | 215683-5014 |
Party name: The City of Philadelphia |