No. 24-620 | |
Title: | Jaime H. Pizarro, et al., Petitioners v. The Home Depot, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | December 6, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-13643) |
Decision Date: | August 2, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 4, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 03 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 02 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent The Home Depot, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 08 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2025. |
Jan 13 2025 | Response Requested. (Due February 12, 2025) |
Jan 23 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2025 to March 14, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 24 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 14, 2025. |
Mar 14 2025 | Brief of respondents The Home Depot, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 27 2025 | Reply of petitioners Jamie H. Pizarro, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 01 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. |
Apr 21 2025 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
David Hahn Tracey Counsel of Record | Sanford Heisler Sharp McKnight, LLP 17 State Street, 37th Floor New York, NY 10004 dtracey@sanfordheisler.com | 6464025650 |
Party name: Jamie H. Pizarro, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Roman Martinez V Counsel of Record | Latham & Watkins, LLP 555 Eleventh Street, NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20004 ROMAN.MARTINEZ@LW.COM | 202-637-3377 |
Party name: The Home Depot, Inc., et al. |