No. 24-5438 | |
Title: | Michael Bowe, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | September 3, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (24-11704) |
Decision Date: | June 27, 2024 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 29 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 3, 2024) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther | |
Sep 11 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 19 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2024. |
Sep 26 2024 | Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2024) |
Oct 29 2024 | Out of time motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2024 to November 27, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 30 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 27, 2024. See Rule 15.1. |
Nov 26 2024 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 09 2024 | Reply of petitioner Michael Bowe filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 12 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025. |
Jan 13 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2025. |
Jan 17 2025 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. |
Feb 20 2025 | Kasdin M. Mitchell, Esquire, of Dallas, Texas, is invited to brief and argue, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below as to Question 1 presented by the petition for a writ of certiorari. |
Feb 28 2025 | Motion for an extension of time filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 03 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including April 7, 2025. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 11, 2025. The brief of the Court-appointed amicus curiae shall be filed on or before August 22, 2025. |
Mar 03 2025 | Briefs of amicus curiae in support of the petitioner on either question presented are to be filed on or before April 14, 2025. Any other briefs of amicus curiae are to be filed on or before August 29, 2025. |
Apr 07 2025 | Brief of petitioner Michael Bowe filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 07 2025 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
Main Document | |
Apr 14 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 14 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 14 2025 | Brief amici curiae of University of Virginia School of Law’s Civil Rights Clinic, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 14 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Habeas Scholars filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 14 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrew Lee Adler Counsel of Record | Federal Public Defender's Office One East Broward Blvd. Suite 1100 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 ANDREW_ADLER@FD.ORG | 9543567436 |
Party name: Michael Bowe | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Kasdin M. Mitchell Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 4550 Travis Street Dallas, TX 75225 kasdin.mitchell@kirkland.com | 202-389-5165 |
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Other | ||
Kwaku Affawua Akowuah Counsel of Record | Sidley Austin LLP 1501 K Street NW Washington, DC 20005 kakowuah@sidley.com | 202 736 8000 |
Party name: Habeas Scholars | ||
Jeffrey Weihao Chen Counsel of Record | Bondurant Mixson & Elmore, LLP 1201 West Peachtree St NW, Suite 3900 Atlanta, GA 30309 chen@bmelaw.com | 404-881-4104 |
Party name: FEDERAL COURTS SCHOLARS | ||
Jennifer Niles Coffin Counsel of Record | Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee 800 S. Gay Street Suite 2400 Knoxville, TN 37929 JENNIFER_COFFIN@FD.ORG | (865) 637-7979 |
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders | ||
Gary Michael Fox Counsel of Record | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP 2100 Pennsylvania Avenue NW Washington, DC 20037 gary.fox@wilmerhale.com | (202) 663-6000 |
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers | ||
Juan Otoniel Perla Counsel of Record | Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP 1717 Pennsylvania Ave NW Washington, DC 20006 JPERLA@CURTIS.COM | (212) 452-7373 |
Party name: University of Virginia School of Law’s Civil Rights Clinic and Four Other Civil Rights Organizations |