No. 24-528 | |
Title: | Phil Lyman, Petitioner v. Spencer J. Cox, Governor of Utah, et al. |
Docketed: | November 12, 2024 |
Linked with 24A529 | |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Utah |
Case Numbers: | (20240824) |
Decision Date: | August 15, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 17 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 21 2024 | Application (24A529) for injunction pending review and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 04 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Spencer J. Cox to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 10 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Lt. Gov. Deidre Henderson to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 11 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Trent Staggs, et. al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 13 2024 | Application (24A529) denied by Justice Gorsuch. |
Dec 18 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025. |
Jan 13 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
Feb 04 2025 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 12 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2025. |
Mar 03 2025 | Rehearing DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Phil Lyman | 333 South Main Street Blanding, UT 84511 phlyman@gmail.com | |
Party name: Phil Lyman | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Stanford Edward Purser Counsel of Record | Utah Attorney General's Office 350 North State Street, Suite 230 P.O. Box 1402320 Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320 SPURSER@AGUTAH.GOV | 801-366-0379 |
Party name: Lt. Gov. Deidre Henderson | ||
Jacey Skinner Counsel of Record | Ballard Spahr LLP 201 South Main Street, Suite 800 Salt Lake City, UT 84111 skinnerj@ballardspahr.com | 801 531-3000 |
Party name: Spencer J. Cox | ||
Other | ||
Edward Lacy Tarpley Jr. Counsel of Record | Edward L. Tarpley, Jr. A Professional Law Corp. 819 Johnston Street Alexandria, LA 71301 ed@edtarpley.com | 318-487-1460 |
Party name: Trent Staggs, Kris Kimball, and 216 Utah Convention Delegates, and Republicans, et. al. |