No. 24-435 | |
Title: | GHP Management Corporation, et al., Petitioners v. City of Los Angeles, California, et al. |
Docketed: | October 17, 2024 |
Linked with 24A150 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-55013) |
Decision Date: | May 31, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 06 2024 | Application (24A150) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2024 to October 13, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main Document | |
Aug 08 2024 | Application (24A150) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 13, 2024. |
Oct 15 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2024) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 12 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent City of Los Angeles to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 12 2024 | Brief amici curiae of The Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 13 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents Alliance of California for Community Empowerment Action; Strategic Action for a Just Economy; and Coalition for Economic Survival to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 14 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 15 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of GRE Downtowner LLC filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 15 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Citizen Action Defense Fund filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 15 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Minnesota Multi Housing Association filed. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | |
Nov 15 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Business Properties Association filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 18 2024 | Brief amici curiae of California Apartment Association, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 18 2024 | Brief amici curiae of More Housing Now!, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 18 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 18 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 18 2024 | Brief amici curiae of The Buckeye Institute, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 26 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2024. |
Dec 03 2024 | Response Requested. (Due January 2, 2025) |
Dec 09 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2025 to February 18, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 09 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 18, 2025, for all respondents. |
Feb 18 2025 | Brief of respondents City of Los Angeles, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 18 2025 | Brief of respondents Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 18 2025 | Lodging proposal under Rule 32.3 from counsel for respondent City of Los Angeles filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 28 2025 | Reply of petitioners GHP Management Corporation, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 05 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/21/2025. |
Mar 20 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 24 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2025. |
Mar 26 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 31 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/4/2025. |
Apr 01 2025 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 14 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. |
Apr 21 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/25/2025. |
Apr 28 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Blvd. Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22209 TAYLOR@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM | 703-243-9423 |
Party name: GHP Management Corporation, et al. | ||
Douglas J. Dennington | Rutan & Tucker, LLP 18575 Jamboree Road 9th Floor Irvine, CA 92612 DDENNINGTON@RUTAN.COM | (714) 641-5100 |
Party name: GHP Management Corporation, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Jonathan H. Eisenman Counsel of Record | Los Angeles City Attorney's Office 221 N. Figueroa Street 10th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90012 jonathan.eisenman@ladwp.com | (213) 783-5570 |
Party name: City of Los Angeles | ||
Mark D. Rosenbaum Counsel of Record | Public Counsel 610 S. Ardmore Ave. Los Angeles, CA 90005 mrosenbaum@publiccounsel.org | (213) 385-2977 |
Party name: Alliance of California for Community Empowerment Action; Strategic Action for a Just Economy; and Coalition for Economic Survival | ||
Halley W. Josephs | Susman Godfrey, LLP 1900 Avenue of the Stars, Suite #1400 Los Angeles, CA 90067 hjosephs@susmangodfrey.com | 310-789-3100 |
Party name: Alliance of California for Community Empowerment Action; Strategic Action for a Just Economy; and Coalition for Economic Survival | ||
Other | ||
Joseph William Anthony Counsel of Record | Anthony Ostlund Louwagie Dressen & Boylan P.A. 90 S. 7th Street Suite 3600 Minneapolis, MN 55402 janthony@anthonyostlund.com | 612-349-6969 |
Party name: Minnesota Multi Housing Association | ||
Michael M. Berger Counsel of Record | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP 2049 Century Park East Suite 1700 Los Angeles, CA 90067 MMBERGER@MANATT.COM | (310) 312-4185 |
Party name: The Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute and Owners Counsel of America | ||
Anthony Thomas Caso Counsel of Record | Constitutional Counsel Group 1628 N Main St. #289 Salinas, CA 93906 ATCASO@CCG1776.COM | 916-601-1916 |
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence | ||
John DiLorenzo Jr. Counsel of Record | Davis Wright Tremaine LLP 560 SW 10th Ave Suite 700 Portland, OR 97205 johndilorenzo@dwt.com | 5032412300 |
Party name: More Housing Now! and Washington Multi-Family Housing Association | ||
Jonathan M. Houghton Counsel of Record | Pacific Legal Foundation 3100 Clarendon Blvd. Suite 1000 Arlington, VA 22201 Jhoughton@pacificlegal.org | 2028886881 |
Party name: Washington Business Properties Association | ||
Marc Alexander Lindemann Counsel of Record | Pierson Ferdinand LLP 5507 Nesconset Hwy., #10-218 Mount Sinai, NY 10020 marc.lindemann@pierferd.com | (646) 347-7952 |
Party name: Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., et al. | ||
Jackson Wilder Maynard Jr. Counsel of Record | Citizen Action Defense Fund 111 21st Ave SW Ste. 13 Olympia, WA 98501 jackson@citizenactiondefense.org | 8505193495 |
Party name: Citizen Action Defense Fund | ||
William Christopher Pooser Counsel of Record | Stoel Rives LLP 101 South Capitol Blvd., Suite 1900 Boise, ID 83702 christopher.pooser@stoel.com | (208) 389-9000 |
Party name: GRE Downtowner LLC | ||
Jeffrey Michael Schwab Counsel of Record | Liberty Justice Center 7500 Rialto Blvd. Suite 1-250 Austin, TX 78735 JSchwab@LJC.org | 512-481-4400 |
Party name: Liberty Justice Center | ||
Christopher Elliott Skinnell Counsel of Record | Nielsen Merksamer Parrinello Gross and Leoni, LLP 2350 Kerner Blvd. Suite 250 San Rafael, CA 94901 cskinnell@nmgovlaw.com | 4153896800 |
Party name: California Apartment Association & San Francisco Apartment Association | ||
David Christian Tryon Counsel of Record | The Buckeye Institute 88 East Broad Street Suite 1300 Columbus, OH 43215 d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org | (614) 224-4422 |
Party name: The Buckeye Institute and Manhattan Institute |