No. 24-428 | |
Title: | Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, et al., Petitioners v. Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., et al. |
Docketed: | October 16, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2022-1877) |
Decision Date: | March 25, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 21, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 11 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 15 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 15 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Advanced Medical Technology Association filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 19 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2024. |
Nov 20 2024 | Response Requested. (Due December 20, 2024) |
Nov 25 2024 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioners. |
Main Document | |
Dec 20 2024 | Brief of respondents Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025. |
Dec 27 2024 | Reply of petitioners Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 13 2025 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Daniel L. Geyser Counsel of Record | Haynes and Boone, LLP 2801 N. Harwood Street, Ste. 2300 Dallas, TX 75201 DANIEL.GEYSER@HAYNESBOONE.COM | 303-382-6219 |
Party name: Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
J. David Hadden Counsel of Record | Fenwick & West LLP Silicon Valley Center, 801 California Street Mountain View, CA 94041 dhadden@fenwick.com | 650-9888500 |
Party name: Meril Life Sciences Pvt. Ltd., et al. | ||
Other | ||
Daniel N. Lerman Counsel of Record | Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP 2000 K Street NW 4th Floor Washington, DC 20006 dlerman@kramerlevin.com | 202-775-4524 |
Party name: Advanced Medical Technology Association |