No. 24-403 | |
Title: | Cai Hunter McIntosh, Petitioner v. Washington |
Docketed: | October 10, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 2 |
Case Numbers: | (57583-3-II) |
Decision Date: | March 5, 2024 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | July 10, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 08 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2024) |
Petition | |
Nov 05 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Washington to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Nov 19 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2024. |
Dec 09 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Brian Christopher Zuanich Counsel of Record | Zuanich Law PLLC 1420 5th Avenue, Suite 2200 Seattle, WA 98101 brian@zuanichlaw.com | 206-829-8415 |
Party name: Cai Hunter McIntosh | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Rachael Rogers Counsel of Record | Clark County Prosecuting Attorney's Office 1013 Franklin Street, P.O. Box 5000 Vancouver, WA 98683 rachael.rogers@clark.wa.gov | 564-397-4427 |
Party name: Washington |