No. 24-316 | |
Title: | Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners v. Braidwood Management, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | September 19, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-10326) |
Decision Date: | June 21, 2024 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 19 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2024) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Oct 21 2024 | Brief amici curiae of The American Public Health Association, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 21 2024 | Brief amici curiae of The American Cancer Society, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 21 2024 | Brief amici curiae of 35 Health Care Access Organizations filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 21 2024 | Brief of respondents Braidwood Management, Inc., et al. in support filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 21 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Illinois, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 18 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025. |
Dec 18 2024 | Reply of petitioners Xavier Becerra, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 10 2025 | Petition GRANTED. |
Feb 18 2025 | Brief of petitioners Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 18 2025 | Joint appendix filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 24 2025 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 21, 2025. |
Feb 24 2025 | Brief amici curiae of American Hospital Association, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 25 2025 | Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. |
Feb 25 2025 | Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER. |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of National Alliance of State and Territorial AIDS Directors, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of United States of Care, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Gilead Sciences, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of American Public Health Association, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Chronic Illness and Disability Partnership, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of The Susan G. Komen Breast Cancer Foundation, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of HIV and Hepatitis Policy Institute, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Patient and Physician Professional Organizations filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Illinois, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 25 2025 | Amicus brief of 48 Bipartisan Economic and Social Science Scholars not accepted for filing. (To be corrected - February 28, 2025) |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of 48 Bipartisan Economic and Social Science Scholars filed. (Corrected) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 25 2025 | Amicus brief of Center for HIV Law and Policy, et al. not accepted for filing. (To be corrected - February 28, 2025) |
Feb 25 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Center for HIV Law and Policy, et al. filed. (Corrected) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 25 2025 | Amicus brief of 35 Health Care Access Organizations not accepted for filing. (Counsel of record resubmitted using corrected notice of appearance--National Alliance of State and Territorial Aids Directors, et al.--April 01, 2025.) |
Mar 03 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of American College of Gastroenterology in support of neither party filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 07 2025 | Record received electronically from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas and available with the Clerk. |
Mar 19 2025 | CIRCULATED |
Mar 20 2025 | Brief of respondents Braidwood Management, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 21 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 26 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Christian Employers Alliance filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 11 2025 | Reply of petitioners Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 21 2025 | Argued. For petitioners: Hashim M. Mooppan, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Jonathan F. Mitchell, Austin, Tex. |
Apr 24 2025 | The parties are directed to file supplemental letter briefs addressing the following question: Whether Congress has “by Law” vested the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services with the authority to appoint members of the United States Preventive Services Task Force. U. S. Const. art. II, §2, cl. 2. The briefs should address this Court’s decisions in United States v. Hartwell, 6 Wall. 385 (1868), and United States v. Smith, 124 U. S. 525 (1888). The briefs, not to exceed 15 pages, are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Monday, May 5, 2025. |
May 02 2025 | Motion of New Civil Liberties Alliance for leave to file amicus brief submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 05 2025 | Supplemental letter brief of petitioners Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main Document | |
May 05 2025 | Supplemental brief of respondent Braidwood Management, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, D 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Robert F. Kennedy, Jr., Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Jonathan F. Mitchell Counsel of Record | Mitchell Law PLLC 111 Congress Avenue Suite 400 Austin, TX 78701 jonathan@mitchell.law | (512) 686-3940 |
Party name: Braidwood Management, Inc., et al. | ||
Other | ||
Margaret Ann Little Counsel of Record | New Civil Liberties Alliance 4250 N Fairfax Dr. Suite 300 Arlington, VA 22203 peggy.little@ncla.legal | 2028695212 |
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance | ||
Jose Idio Abrigo Jr. Counsel of Record | Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund 120 Wall Street 19th Floor New York, NY 10005 jabrigo@lambdalegal.org | 212-809-8585 |
Party name: National Alliance of State and Territorial Aids Directors and Other HIV, LGBTQ, and Healthcare Organizations | ||
Kwaku Affawua Akowuah Counsel of Record | Sidley Austin LLP Sidley Austin LLP 1501 K Street NW Washington, DC 20005 kakowuah@sidley.com | 202 736 8000 |
Party name: Gilead Sciences, Inc. | ||
Thomas Arthur Berry Counsel of Record | Cato Institute 1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW Washington, DC 20001 tberry@cato.org | (443) 254-6330 |
Party name: Cato Institute | ||
Jay Randall Carson Counsel of Record | The Buckeye Institute 88 East Broad Street Suite 1300 Columbus, OH 43215 j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org | (614) 224-4422 |
Party name: The Buckeye Institute | ||
David W. DeBruin Counsel of Record | Jenner and Block 1099 New York Ave., NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 DDeBruin@jenner.com | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: The Center for HIV Law and Policy and Other Leading Health Policy and Reproductive Justice Organizations | ||
David C. Frederick Counsel of Record | Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C. 1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400 Washington, DC 20036-3209 DFREDERICK@KELLOGGHANSEN.COM | 202-326-7900 |
Party name: The Susan G. Komen Breast Cancer Foundation, Inc. | ||
Chad Ian Golder Counsel of Record | American Hospital Association Two City Center, Suite 400 800 Tenth Street, NW Washington, DC 20001 chadgolder@gmail.com | (202) 638-1100 |
Party name: American Hospital Association, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Federation of American Hospitals, America's Essential Hospitals, and Association of American Medical Colleges | ||
Erin Morrow Hawley Counsel of Record | Alliance Defending Freedom 440 First Street NW Suite 600 Washington, DC 20001 EHAWLEY@ADFLEGAL.ORG | 4178343372 |
Party name: Christian Employers Alliance | ||
Matthew S. Hellman Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 1099 New York Ave., NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 MHELLMAN@JENNER.COM | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: 48 Bipartisan Economic and Other Social Science Scholars | ||
Richard Henry Hughes IV Counsel of Record | Epstein Becker & Green 1227 25th St NW #700 Washington, DC 20037 rhhughes@ebglaw.com | 2028614186 |
Party name: HIV and Hepatitis Policy Institute, et al. | ||
Daniel Gordon Jarcho Counsel of Record | Alston & Bird LLP The Atlantic Building 950 F Street NW Washington, DC 20004 daniel.jarcho@alston.com | (202) 239-3300 |
Party name: United States of Care and 47 Other Organizations | ||
R. Trent McCotter Counsel of Record | Boyden Gray PLLC 800 Connecticut Ave. NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20006 tmccotter@boydengray.com | 202-706-5488 |
Party name: Manhattan Institute | ||
Aaron Lloyd Nielson Counsel of Record | Office of the Texas Attorney General P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov | 512-936-1700 |
Party name: Texas, Florida, Idaho, Indiana, Iowa, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah and West Virginia | ||
Jane Elinor Notz Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois 115 South LaSalle Street 23rd Floor Chicago, IL 60603 JANE.NOTZ@ILAG.GOV | 312-814-5376 |
Party name: Illinois | ||
Beth W. Petronio Counsel of Record | K&L Gates LLP 1717 Main Street, Suite 2800 Dallas, TX 75201 beth.petronio@klgates.com | 2149395500 |
Party name: The American Cancer Society, et al. | ||
Andrew John Pincus Counsel of Record | Mayer Brown LLP 1999 K Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM | 202-263-3000 |
Party name: The American Public Health Association, Public Health Deans and Scholars, The Robert Wood Johnson Foundation, and Public Health Advocates | ||
Michael Poon Counsel of Record | Pacific Legal Foundation 555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290 Sacramento, CA 95814 mpoon@pacificlegal.org | 916.419.7111 |
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation | ||
Timothy Mason Sandefur Counsel of Record | Goldwater Institute 500 E. Coronado Road Phoenix, AZ 85004 TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG | 6024625000 |
Party name: Goldwater Institute | ||
Nicolas Anthony Sansone Counsel of Record | Public Citizen Litigation Group 1600 20th Street NW Washington, DC 20009 nsansone@citizen.org | 202-588-1000 |
Party name: Public Citizen et al. | ||
Andrew L. Schlafly Counsel of Record | 939 Old Chester Road Far Hills, NJ 07931 aschlafly@aol.com | 908-719-8608 |
Party name: Association of American Physicians and Surgeons | ||
Benjamin Gross Shatz Counsel of Record | Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP 2049 Century Park East Suite 1700 Los Angles, CA 90067-3119 bshatz@manatt.com | 3103124000 |
Party name: CHLPI, CIDP, ADA, MRC, CAP, et al. | ||
Andrew Tauber Counsel of Record | Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP 1155 F St NW Suite 700 Washington, DC 20008 andrew.tauber@bclplaw.com | 202-508-6111 |
Party name: American College of Gastroenterology |