No. 24-123 | |
Title: | Chunyi Xu, aka David Xu, Petitioner v. Denver Public Schools, School District No. 1 |
Docketed: | August 2, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-1079) |
Decision Date: | February 6, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 22, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 20 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 03 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Denver Public Schools, School District No. 1 to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 11 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. |
Oct 07 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
Oct 12 2024 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 23 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2024. |
Nov 12 2024 | Rehearing DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Chunyi Xu | 9097 W Floyd Ave. Lakewood, CO 80227 | (720) 891-6503 |
Party name: Xu Chunyi | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jonathan Patrick Fero Counsel of Record | Semple, Farrington, Everall & Case, P.C. 1120 Lincoln Street, Suite 1308 Denver, CO 80203 jfero@semplelaw.com | 303-595-0941 |
Party name: Denver Public Schools, School District No. 1 |