No. 24-1145 | |
Title: | Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Skot Heckman, et al. |
Docketed: | May 7, 2025 |
Linked with 2 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-55770) |
Decision Date: | October 28, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 6, 2024 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 22 2025 | Application (24A728) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 6, 2025 to May 5, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 24 2025 | Application (24A728) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 5, 2025. |
May 05 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 6, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 09 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent Skot Heckman, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
May 13 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/29/2025. |
May 13 2025 | Response Requested. (Due June 12, 2025) |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Roman Martinez V Counsel of Record | Latham & Watkins, LLP 555 Eleventh Street, NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20004 ROMAN.MARTINEZ@LW.COM | 202-637-3377 |
Party name: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Warren David Postman Counsel of Record | Keller Postman LLC 1101 Connecticut Ave. NW Suite 1100 Washington, DC 20036 wdp@kellerpostman.com | (202) 918-1870 |
Party name: Skot Heckman et al. |