No. 24-1058 | |
Title: | CloudofChange, LLC, Petitioner v. NCR Corporation |
Docketed: | April 8, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2023-1111) |
Decision Date: | December 18, 2024 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 19, 2025 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 04 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2025) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 08 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent NCR Corp. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 16 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jerry Robin Selinger Counsel of Record | Patterson + Sheridan, LLP 1700 Pacific Avenue Suite 2650 Dallas, TX 75201 jselinger@pattersonsheridan.com | (214) 272-0957 |
Party name: CloudofChange, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Paul Whitfield Hughes Counsel of Record | McDermott Will & Emery 500 North Capitol Street NW Washington, DC 20001 phughes@mwe.com | (202) 756-8988 |
Party name: NCR Corp. |