No. 23A843
Title:Peter K. Navarro, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:March 15, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-3006)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2024Application (23A843) for release pending appeal submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 15 2024Response to application (23A843) requested by The Chief Justice, due March 18, 2024, by 2pm (EDT).
Mar 18 2024Response to application from respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 18 2024Application (23A843) denied by The Chief Justice. (Detached In-Chambers Opinion)
Apr 02 2024Application (23A843) refiled and submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Apr 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stanley Edmund Woodward
    Counsel of Record
Brand Woodward Law, LP
400 Fifth Street Northwest
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20001

stanley@brandwoodwardlaw.com
2029967447
Party name: Peter Navarro
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States