No. 23A745
Title:Donald J. Trump, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:February 12, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-3228)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2024Application (23A745) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 13 2024Response to application (23A745) requested by The Chief Justice, due February 20, 2024, by 4pm (EST).
Feb 13 2024Brief amicus curiae of Jon Danforth, J. Michael Luttig, Carter Phillips, Peter Keisler, Larry Thompson, Stuart Gerson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 13 2024Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2024Response to application from respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2024Brief amicus curiae of Protect Democracy Project filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2024Reply of applicant Donald J. Trump filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Feb 15 2024Amicus brief of David Boyle submitted.
Main Document
Feb 16 2024Amicus brief of Alabama and 21 Other States submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2024Amicus brief of Christian Family Coalition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2024Amicus brief of Jeremy Bates submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 20 2024Amicus brief of Former Attorney General Edwin Meese III, Law Professors Steven Calabresi and Gary Lawson, and Citizens United submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
James Otis Law Group, LLC
13321 North Outer Forty Road
Suite 300
St. Louis, MO 63017

John.Sauer@james-otis.com
314-562-0031
Party name: President Donald J. Trump
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
Counselor to the Special Counsel
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20530

SCO_JLS_SupremeCtBriefs@usdoj.gov
202-305-9654
Party name: United States
Other
Genevieve Clair Nadeau
    Counsel of Record
Protect Democracy
15 Main Street, Ste. 312
Watertown, MA 02472

genevieve.nadeau@protectdemocracy.org
3107707247
Party name: Protect Democracy Project
Richard Douglas Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
1875 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

rbernsteinlaw@gmail.com
3017752064
Party name: JOHN DANFORTH, J. MICHAEL LUTTIG, CARTER PHILLIPS, PETER KEISLER, LARRY THOMPSON, STUART GERSON, ET AL.,
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV
334-242-7300
Party name: Alabama and 21 Other States
Dennis Grossman
    Counsel of Record
6701 Sunset Drive, Suite 104
Miami, FL 33143

dagrossmanlaw@aol.com
5164666690
Party name: Christian Family Coalition
Jeremy Charles Bates
    Counsel of Record
21 West Street Apt. 21J
New York, NY 10006

jeremybates3@gmail.com
917-626-2473
Party name: Jeremy Bates
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Former Attorney General Edwin Meese III, Law Professors Steven Calabresi and Gary Lawson, and Citizens United