No. 23A384
Title:United States Steel Corporation, Applicant
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:October 31, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1207 23-1157)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2023Application (23A384) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentOther
Oct 31 2023Response to application (23A384) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 4 p.m. (EDT) on November 2, 2023.
Nov 02 2023Response to application from respondent Environmental Protection Agency filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 02 2023Response to application from respondents New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County, TX filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 02 2023Response to application from respondent Environmental Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 03 2023Reply of applicant United States Steel Corporation filed.
ReplyProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John David Lazzaretti
    Counsel of Record
Squire Sanders (US) LLP
1000 Key Tower
127 Public Square
Cleveland, OH 44114

john.lazzaretti@squirepb.com
2164798350
Party name: United States Steel Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Megan Marie Herzog
    Counsel of Record
Donahue & Goldberg, LLP
1008 Pennsylvania Avenue SE
Washington, DC 20003

megan@donahuegoldberg.com
650-353-8719
Party name: Environmental Defense Fund
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: States of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County, TX
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: U. S. Environmental Protection Agency